CA AR86 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Read. Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Social Work Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Social Work Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Assembly - HR 86 Eggman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12AssemblyRead. Adopted.
2020-03-05AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 5).
2020-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-26AssemblyIntroduced.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback