CA AR81 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-12)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-12)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Vaisakhi.
Title
Relative to Vaisakhi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Assembly - HR 81 Kalra Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0.). |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 21). |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | Introduced. |