CA AR77 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-15-1)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Read. Adopted. (Page 4094.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-15-1)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Read. Adopted. (Page 4094.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to World War II Japanese American concentration camps.
Title
Relative to World War II Japanese American concentration camps.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 4094.). |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | (Page 4046.) |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 6). |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | Introduced. |