CA AR77 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-20-1)
Status: Passed on February 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-16 - Read. Adopted. (Page 4029.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-20-1)
Status: Passed on February 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-16 - Read. Adopted. (Page 4029.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Earned Income Tax Credit Week.
Title
Relative to Earned Income Tax Credit Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 4029.). |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 12). |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | Introduced. |