CA AR73 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Read. Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Read. Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Transgender Day of Visibility.
Title
Relative to Transgender Day of Visibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 18). |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. |