CA AR69 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-4-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Read. Adopted. (Page 4093.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-4-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Read. Adopted. (Page 4093.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to immigration.
Title
Relative to immigration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 4093.). |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-02-22 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on February 16 corrected. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 13). |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced. |