CA AR66 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-3-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 60. Noes 1. Page 3248.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-3-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 60. Noes 1. Page 3248.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals program.
Title
Relative to the Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Assembly - HR 66 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 60. Noes 1. Page 3248.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 3223.) |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | Introduced. |