CA AR63 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-25-1)
Status: Introduced on August 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-25 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 6268.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-25 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 6268.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Gold Star Mothers' and Families' Day.
Title
Relative to Gold Star Mothers' and Families' Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-18 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 6268.). |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 18). |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Introduced. |