CA AR62 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-20-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Read. Adopted. (Page 5257.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-20-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Read. Adopted. (Page 5257.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to We Card Awareness Month.
Title
Relative to We Card Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 5257.). |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 17). |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Introduced. |