CA AR6 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-1)
Status: Passed on January 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-30 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 237.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-1)
Status: Passed on January 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-30 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 237.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to women’s reproductive health.
Title
Relative to women’s reproductive health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - Assembly - HR 6 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 237.). |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-01-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 26). |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced. |