CA AR53 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-25-1)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5483.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5483.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Immigrant Heritage Month.
Title
Relative to Immigrant Heritage Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5483.). |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Introduced. |