CA AR52 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-16-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-23 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2469.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-16-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-23 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2469.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Kimchi Day.
Title
Relative to Kimchi Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 2469.). |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Introduced. |