CA AR47 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-23)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2223.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to International Surfing Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to International Surfing Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Matt Dababneh [D]
Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Sebastian Ridley-Thomas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2017-06-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Page 2223.).
2017-06-15AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2017-06-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-06-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
2017-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-06-07AssemblyIntroduced.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback