CA AR44 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-22-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2348.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-22-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2348.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Immigrant Heritage Month.
Title
Relative to Immigrant Heritage Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 2348.). |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | Introduced. |