CA AR4 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-26-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1139.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-27 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1139.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Black April Memorial Week.
Title
Relative to Black April Memorial Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1139.). |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2015-02-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-05 | Assembly | Introduced. |