CA AR39 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-23)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2162.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Loving Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Loving Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]
Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Sebastian Ridley-Thomas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - Assembly - HR 39 MCCARTY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Page 2162.).
2017-06-12AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-05-22AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-05-22AssemblyAction rescinded whereby the resolution was adopted on May 18, 2017.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1622.).
2017-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2017-05-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-05-09AssemblyIntroduced.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback