CA AR37 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-31 - Amended. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6750.) Read. Adopted. (Page 6763.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-31 - Amended. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6750.) Read. Adopted. (Page 6763.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to umbilical cord blood banking.
Title
Relative to umbilical cord blood banking.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-31 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6750.) Read. Adopted. (Page 6763.). | |
2012-08-30 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 29). | |
2012-08-28 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6468.) | |
2012-08-27 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-08-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Amended. | |
2012-08-09 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-08-07 | Introduced. |