CA AR33 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-12-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2372.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-12-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2372.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to World Refugee Day.
Title
Relative to World Refugee Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - HR 33 McCarty Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2372.). |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Introduced. |