CA AR33 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1491.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1491.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to schoolbus drivers.
Title
Relative to schoolbus drivers.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Assembly - HR 33 COOPER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1491.). |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Introduced. |