CA AR32 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-11-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2400.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-11-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2400.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the 25th anniversary of the Los Angeles civil unrest.
Title
Relative to the 25th anniversary of the Los Angeles civil unrest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 2400.). |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Amended. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Introduced. |