CA AR31 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-20)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4028.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4028.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Problem Gambling Awareness Week.
Title
Relative to Problem Gambling Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4028.). |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 27). |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | Introduced. |