CA AR30 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5933.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5933.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the California Career Resource Network.
Title
Relative to the California Career Resource Network.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Assembly - HR 30 Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5933.). |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Amended. |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Amended. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Introduced. |