CA AR25 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-17-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Read. Adopted. (Page 839.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-17-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Read. Adopted. (Page 839.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to César Chávez.
Title
Relative to César Chávez.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 839.). |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Introduced. |