CA AR24 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-11-1)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-22 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 2080.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-22 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 2080.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, and Transgender (LGBT) Pride Month.
Title
Relative to Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, and Transgender (LGBT) Pride Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-22 - Assembly - HR 24 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 2080.) |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Introduced. |