CA AR22 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-21)
Status: Introduced on August 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-26 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2696.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-26 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2696.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the March on Washington 50th anniversary.
Title
Relative to the March on Washington 50th anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-22 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2696.). |
2013-08-22 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 22). |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-08-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | Introduced. |