CA AR21 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-21)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Read. Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Armenian Genocide.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Armenian Genocide.

Sponsors

Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26AssemblyRead. Adopted.
2021-04-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22).
2021-04-22AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-02-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
2021-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-08AssemblyIntroduced.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback