CA AR19 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-20)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2128.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2128.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to International Surfing Day.
Title
Relative to International Surfing Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2128.). |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | Introduced. |