CA AR16 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-22-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-04 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1247.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-04 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1247.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Cinco de Mayo Week.
Title
Relative to Cinco de Mayo Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1247.). |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Introduced. |