CA AR14 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-21)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1340.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1340.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Day of the Teacher.
Title
Relative to the Day of the Teacher.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - Assembly - HR 14 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1340.) | |
2011-05-11 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Com. on ED. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1263.) | |
2011-05-04 | Introduced. |