CA AR121 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-17-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Read. Adopted. (Page 6485.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-17-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Read. Adopted. (Page 6485.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.
Title
Relative to Chiari Malformation Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 6485.). |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-08-07 | Assembly | Introduced. |