CA AR112 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-18-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Read. Adopted. (Page 5930.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-18-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Read. Adopted. (Page 5930.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Immigrant Heritage Month.
Title
Relative to Immigrant Heritage Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 5930.). |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | Introduced. |