CA AR11 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 710.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 710.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to César Chávez.
Title
Relative to César Chávez.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 710.). |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 23). |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Introduced. |