CA AR103 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-01 - Read. Adopted. (Page 5522.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-01 - Read. Adopted. (Page 5522.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the California Bar Examination.
Title
Relative to the California Bar Examination.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-01 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 5522.). |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 14. Page 5184.) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | Introduced. |