CA AR101 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-21-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Read. Adopted. (Page 4892.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-21-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Read. Adopted. (Page 4892.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Sexual Assault Awareness Month and Denim Day.
Title
Relative to Sexual Assault Awareness Month and Denim Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 4892.). |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Introduced. |