CA AJR9 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 104, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 104, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to immigration.
Title
Immigration enforcement tactics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR9 Cristina Garcia et a By Caballero (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - AJR 9 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - AJR 9 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 104, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 1819.) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 11). |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 11. Page 1723.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (May 7). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |