CA AJR50 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-2)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-2)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to blood donation.
Title
Blood donation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 4 AJR50 Bloom By Leno (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Assembly - AJR 50 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Assembly - AJR 50 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4982.) Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4994.) |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 15. Page 6281.) |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (August 19). |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-08-05 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |