CA AJR5 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-22)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 207, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Military Lending Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military Lending Act

Sponsors

Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Sen. Joel Anderson [R]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Sen. Patricia Bates [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]
Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Sen. Anthony Cannella [R]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Matt Dababneh [D]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Sen. Bill Dodd [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Sen. Ted Gaines [R]Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Sen. Steve Glazer [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Sen. Edward Hernandez [D]
Sen. Jerry Hill [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Sen. Ricardo Lara [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Sen. Mike McGuire [D]Sen. Tony Mendoza [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Sen. Jim Nielsen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Sen. Anthony Portantino [D]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Sen. Richard Roth [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Sen. Jeff Stone [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Sen. Andy Vidak [R]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Sen. Scott Wilk [R]

Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Assembly - AJR 5 MEDINA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR5 Medina et al. By Mendoza (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-30 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Assembly - AJR 5 MEDINA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-25AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 207, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2017-09-14AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3386.).
2017-09-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2017-09-12SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2794.)
2017-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-08-30SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2017-08-23SenateRe-referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
2017-07-18SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-07-17AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2573.)
2017-07-17AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-07-13AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-07-13AssemblyFrom Consent Calendar.
2017-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10).
2017-06-22AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-15AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & F.
2017-02-24AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-02-23AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback