CA AJR46 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 204, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to federal zero tolerance immigration policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal zero tolerance immigration policy: family separation.

Sponsors

Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D]Sen. Ricardo Lara [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Sen. Kevin de Leon [D]
Sen. Vanessa Delgado [D]Sen. Bill Dodd [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Sen. Steve Glazer [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Sen. Edward Hernandez [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Sen. Holly Mitchell [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Sen. Richard Pan [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Sen. Scott Wiener [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AJR 46 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR46 Gonzalez Fletcher et al. By Hueso (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-14 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Assembly - AJR 46 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-06AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 204, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 6873.).
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-27SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 5775.)
2018-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-21SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-14SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2018-08-08SenateRe-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2018-07-02SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-07-02AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 6056.)
2018-07-02AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 6050.)
2018-07-02AssemblyWithout reference to committee.
2018-06-22AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-06-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback