CA AJR39 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 203, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to citizenship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Citizenship: internationally adopted children who are now adults.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR39 Choi By Glazer (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - AJR 39 CHOI Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-06AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 203, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-29SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5965.)
2018-08-21SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-08-16AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6308.)
2018-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2018-08-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended.
2018-06-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-27AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-04-26AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback