CA AJR39 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California seafood.
Title
California seafood.
Sponsors
Asm. Wesley Chesbro [D] | Sen. Noreen Evans [D] | Asm. Curt Hagman [R] | Asm. Jared Huffman [D] |
Sen. Doug La Malfa [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-20 - Assembly - AJR 39 CHESBRO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AJR39 Chesbro (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Assembly - AJR 39 CHESBRO Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AJR39 Chesbro (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Assembly - AJR 39 CHESBRO Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-08-28 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:45 a.m. | |
2012-08-20 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6004.). | |
2012-08-16 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2012-08-16 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4525.) | |
2012-08-08 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-06-14 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2012-06-14 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5306.) | |
2012-06-12 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12). | |
2012-05-25 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2012-05-10 | From printer. | |
2012-05-09 | Introduced. To print. |