CA AJR32 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to United States Supreme Court nominations.
Title
United States Supreme Court: nominations.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-22 - Assembly - AJR 32 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR32 Alejo By Hertzberg (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - AJR 32 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR32 Alejo By Hertzberg (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Assembly - AJR 32 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 6049.). |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 4950.) |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 14). |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 4458.) |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 5). |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |