CA AJR32 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-29 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-29 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a federal constitutional convention.
Title
Federal constitutional convention: application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2012-05-01 | In committee: Refused adoption. | |
2012-04-17 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-04-11 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. | |
2012-03-26 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. | |
2012-03-21 | From printer. | |
2012-03-20 | Introduced. To print. |