CA AJR30 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-17-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-17-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to freight transportation.
Title
Freight transportation: federal funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AJR30 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-10 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Assembly - AJR 30 Gipson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-10 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Assembly - AJR 30 Gipson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-23 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4881.) |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-08-10 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 10). |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.) |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |