CA AJR29 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-28 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-28 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to pollinators.
Title
Pollinators.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Allen [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-28 - Assembly - AJR 29 ALLEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-28 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |
2012-08-28 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 13. Page 6434.) | |
2012-08-24 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-22 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 22). | |
2012-08-07 | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | |
2012-06-06 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-05-09 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |