CA AJR23 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-10-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 145, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-10-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 145, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Title IX.
Title
Title IX: 50th anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR23 Boerner Horvath et a By Skinner (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Assembly - AJR 23 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Assembly - AJR 23 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 145, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-19 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4843.) |
2022-08-03 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0.) |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 15). |
2022-02-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-01-13 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |