CA AJR2 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-21)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-21)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Armenian Genocide.
Title
Armenian Genocide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AJR2 Gatto By De Le (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - AJR2 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - AJR2 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2013. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:50 p.m. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | In Senate. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 523.) |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 907.) |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2013-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2012-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. |
2012-12-03 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |