CA AJR19 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 208, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 208, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to opioid awareness and dependency prevention.
Title
Opioid awareness and dependency prevention: patient-centered postsurgical care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - AJR 19 ARAMBULA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR19 Arambula By Leyva (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - AJR 19 ARAMBULA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR19 Arambula By Leyva (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - AJR 19 ARAMBULA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 208, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3383.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2763.) |
2017-09-06 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Measure version as amended on September 5 corrected. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2767.) |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | From printer. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |