CA AJR16 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-21)
Status: Passed on September 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Armenian Genocide.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Armenian Genocide.

Sponsors

Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Sen. Bob Archuleta [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]
Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]
Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]
Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Sen. Anthony Portantino [D]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Sen. Scott Wilk [R]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-09-05 - Assembly - AJR 16 Luz Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AJR16 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AJR 16 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2019-09-05AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3010.).
2019-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2019-08-30SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2327.)
2019-08-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-08-27SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 27).
2019-08-14SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-04-23SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-04-22AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1242.)
2019-04-22AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2019-04-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-04-09AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback