CA AJR14 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-6-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 104, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-6-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 104, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Title IX.
Title
Title IX: 49th anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-23 - Assembly - AJR 14 Boerner Horvath Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR14 Boerner Horvath et a By Leyva (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Assembly - AJR 14 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR14 Boerner Horvath et a By Leyva (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Assembly - AJR 14 Boerner Horvath Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 104, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-08-27 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 2465.). |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2039.) |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1971.) |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |