CA AJR10 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-3-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-3-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to access to counsel.
Title
Access to Counsel Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR10 Santiago et al. By Hueso (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AJR 10 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AJR 10 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2293.) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 20). |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 2. Page 1714.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-07 | Assembly | From printer. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |